MA H1602 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the prohibition on striking by public employees and public employee organizations. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Protecting the right to strike
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5123 |
2019-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2342 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2409 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2409 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1602 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1602.pdf |