MA H1706 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing a board of registration of licensed mental health counselors. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a board of registration of licensed mental health counselors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H244 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S681 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1332 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S146 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S134 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S165 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H889 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3873 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Senate concurred
S2298 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback