MA H1712 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4723
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to preventing overdose deaths and increasing access to treatment. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to preventing overdose deaths and increasing access to treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4723 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H2016 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1884 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1463 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
H4723 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1884 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1463 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
H4723 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1712 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1712.pdf |