MA H1764 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to zoning voting thresholds. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to zoning voting thresholds
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1765 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1766 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3883 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3931 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1765 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1766 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3883 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3931 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1764 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1764.pdf |