MA H1781 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for a local option for municipalities to assess fees on new developments to support the cost of expanded or upgraded water infrastructure. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the establishment of sustainable water resource funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-01-13HouseRules suspended
2020-01-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-12-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-08-29JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1478 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1479 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1480 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1481 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1482 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
H4154 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Pending new draft of H4039

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback