MA H1790 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing municipalities to expend certain funds for the acquisition of land to be used for rail trails. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing municipalities to expend certain funds for the acquisition of land to be used for rail trails

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-01-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2019-12-19HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-10-07JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H1838 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
H1804 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2535 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653
H365 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H2953 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2017 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S308 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H4077 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2019
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4094 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2020
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4277 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback