MA H1836 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to establish ridgeline and hillside protection district review boards. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to hillside protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5127 |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1796 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5127 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H290 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1796 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5127 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1836 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1836.pdf |