MA H1870 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4449

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize trauma kits, so-called and trained designees in certain public buildings. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to requiring trauma kits in public buildings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4449
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S75 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1337 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback