MA H1892 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-11-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to original birth certificates to persons born in the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
Granting equal access to original birth certificates to all persons born in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-07-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S304 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S640 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S304 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S640 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1892.pdf |