MA H1947 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting the marketing of sugary drinks on school grounds. Public Health.
Title
To protect youth from the health risks of sugary drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1355 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1709 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2529 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1709 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2529 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1947 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1947.pdf |