MA H2038 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4436
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a regional lockup facility in Suffolk County. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing a regional lockup facility in Suffolk County
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. Edward Coppinger [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] |
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] | Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4436 |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1412 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H4436 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4436 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2038 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2038.pdf |