MA H2047 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to inmate visitation. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To strengthen inmate visitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-01JointHearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H3304 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3431 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S969 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3430 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S1357 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1369 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback