MA H2070 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulations requiring secure videotaping of the booking process of state police arrestees. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to regulations requiring secure videotaping of the booking process of state police arrestees
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5117 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3497 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2070 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2070.pdf |