MA H2073 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-25)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to benefits for county sheriffs' correction officers and jail officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure pay parity for county sheriffs' correction officers and jail officers

Sponsors

Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Paul Frost [R]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. John Velis [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Donald Wong [R]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-01JointHearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H3441 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2163 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1409 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback