MA H2120 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a taskforce on a uniform code for police body-worn cameras and recordings. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish a taskforce to develop a uniform code for police body-worn cameras and their recordings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2150 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2070 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S2219 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H3748 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Senate concurred
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2260 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback