MA H2149 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-12)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish the Massachusetts law enforcement memorial fund. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Massachusetts Law Enforcement Memorial Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H3371 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H2368 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
H2689 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2173 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2173
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1358 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1386 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1394 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1791 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1445 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback