MA H2163 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the periodic inspections of elevators and lifts. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Amending the periodic inspections of elevators and lifts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2163 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2163.pdf |