MA H2188 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the payment of collective bargaining agency service fees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the payment of an agency service fee
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2372 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2177 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1467 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2177 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1467 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2188.pdf |