MA H2207 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mandatory coverage for certain health screenings for firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to mandatory coverage for certain health screenings for firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4104 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2239 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2279 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4104 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2239 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2279 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2207.pdf |