MA H2219 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2321
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance premium contribution levels for certain retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to protecting local retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied H2321 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S620 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1523 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
H3653 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2321 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1523 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
H3653 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2321 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2219.pdf |