MA H2222 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to health insurance benefits for certain surviving spouses. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to health insurance for surviving spouses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-24HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-07-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1483 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2264 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
H1102 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H3784 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback