MA H2243 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2213
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the amount of hours that retired public employees may work for certain additional public service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the cap on work hours for retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied H2213 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2326 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2214 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1579 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2213 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2326 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2214 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1579 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2213 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2243.pdf |