MA H2264 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1515
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to death benefits for surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-30 | House | Accompanied by S1515 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3079 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1515 (Replaces) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3079 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1515 (Replaces) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2264 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2264.pdf |