MA H2269 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement for certain nuclear energy related employees of University of Massachusetts Lowell. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement for nuclear reactor operators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied S1514 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2269 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2269.pdf |