MA H2310 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include transitional parole officer I, II, III employees of the Parole Board in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend retirement benefits for certain employees of the Parole Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-28JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2375 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2237 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2307 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1526 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback