MA H2345 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public higher education collective labor contracts. Public Service.
Title
Relative to public higher education collective labor contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H481 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
S753 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
S753 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2345 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2345.pdf |