MA H2356 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Norwood be authorized to continue the employment of police chief William G. Brooks, III. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Norwood to continue the employment of police chief William G. Brooks, III

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2020
2020-03-19SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-03-19HouseEnacted
2020-03-18SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-03-18SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-10-03SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-08-15SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-08-12HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-05-20HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-05-20HouseRules suspended
2019-05-20HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-05-06HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3124 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2081 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback