MA H2358 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to classify certain probation officers and court officers in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to further defining employees classified in Group 4
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2375 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2307 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2375 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2307 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2358.pdf |