MA H2414 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize voluntary contributions on income tax returns for a separate fund to be known as the Massachusetts fund for vulnerable countries most affected by climate change. Revenue.
Title
To allow individual donations to countries vulnerable to climate change
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4470 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1602 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H749 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H4470 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1602 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H749 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H4470 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2414.pdf |