MA H2434 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1646
Note: Replaces legislation S1795
Note: Replaces legislation S1795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the earned income tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Improving the earned income credit for working families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied by S1614, S1619, S1640, S1646, S1795 and H2431 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2439 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H2431 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1614 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1619 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1646 (Replaces) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1795 (Replaces) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H2431 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1614 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1619 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1646 (Replaces) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1795 (Replaces) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2434 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2434.pdf |