MA H2514 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting municipalities from the gas tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to exempting municipalities from the gas tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2547 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H831 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H831 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2514 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2514.pdf |