MA H2522 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4465
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the limit on tax credits for donations of certified land to public or private conservation agencies. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the conservation land tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4465 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
S2292 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
S2303 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019
H4465 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
S2292 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
S2303 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019
H4465 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2522 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2522.pdf |