MA H2653 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2535

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize municipalities to assess certain taxes for financing regional transportation needs and investments. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regional transportation ballot initiatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2020-06-26HouseAccompanied by H2535
2020-05-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-09HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-12HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 10, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1694 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2535 (Replaces) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback