MA H2671 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-04 - Accompanied S1810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-04 - Accompanied S1810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the employment of persons with disabilities on state contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the employment of persons with disabilities on state contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Accompanied S1810 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2719 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1585 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2019
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S1585 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2019
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2671 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2671.pdf |