MA H2681 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that government agencies make certain demographic data available to the public. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Ensuring equitable representation in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1094 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1821 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3248 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1222 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1821 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3248 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1222 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2681 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2681.pdf |