MA H2763 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase competition and reduce costs for constructing water treatment plants. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase competition and reduce costs for constructing water treatment plants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H1371 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1624 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H2665 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H374 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
S1918 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S1364 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S79 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3814 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2320 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback