MA H2849 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce greenhouse gas emissions by reducing energy use, increasing efficiency and encouraging renewable sources of energy and other energy policies. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
For utility transition to using renewable energy (FUTURE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | House concurred |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 22, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1940 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1945 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1945 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2849 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2849.pdf |