MA H2866 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to net metering for on-site renewable energy facilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to net metering for on-site renewable energy facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2870 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2829 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2006 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1926 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1925
S1974 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1999 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2870 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2829 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2006 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1926 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1925
S1974 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1999 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2866 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2866.pdf |