MA H2958 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require operators of recreational utility vehicles to participate in a training program. Transportation.
Title
To regulate the training and supervision of snowmobiles
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4772 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S477 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2281
S1670 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H848 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2281
S2281 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
S1670 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H848 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2281
S2281 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2958 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2958.pdf |