MA H2994 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the installation and operation of digital video violation detection monitoring systems to detect drivers failing to stop for school buses. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the safety of school children embarking and disembarking school buses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3142 (Similar To) 2019-09-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1356 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1397 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1448 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H2034 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback