MA H3093 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt school buses from paying tolls. Transportation.
Title
Regarding Massachusetts Department of Transportation exemption for school buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3174 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1717 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2034 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
S1397 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S108 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1717 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2034 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
S1397 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S108 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3093 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3093.pdf |