MA H3118 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3092
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Accompanied H3092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Accompanied H3092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce traffic fatalities by reducing crashes and incidents involving a motor vehicle and certain vulnerable users. Transportation.
Title
To reduce traffic fatalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Accompanied H3092 |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
S2113 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3092 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
S2113 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3092 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3118 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3118.pdf |