MA H3156 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of motorized scooters. Transportation.
Title
Relative to section 1E of Chapter 90
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2034 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2047 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2049 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3073 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S2034 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2047 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2049 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3073 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3156 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3156.pdf |