MA H3215 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4404
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include veterans' service officers as mandated reporters of abuse to elderly persons and persons with disabilities. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Establishing veterans’ service officers as mandated reporters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4404 |
2019-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1155 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1743 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4536
H626 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H1445 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1140 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H603 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2343 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - New draft substituted, see S2367
S2367 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2020
H4404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1743 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4536
H626 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H1445 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1140 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H603 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2343 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - New draft substituted, see S2367
S2367 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2020
H4404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3215 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3215.pdf |