MA H3239 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5005
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Sabadosa of Northampton, a petition of Lindsay N. Sabadosa and others for the establishment of a citizens commission concerning alignment with the United Nations treaty on the prohibition of nuclear weapons. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolve creating a citizens commission concerning the commonwealth of Massachusetts being in alignment with the UN treaty on the prohibition of nuclear weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5005 |
2019-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2202 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2165 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1516 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3211 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2157 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3240 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5006
S2155 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H5005 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2165 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1516 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3211 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2157 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3240 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5006
S2155 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H5005 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3239 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3239.pdf |