MA H3288 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting sex offenders from entering public or private school property for any reason. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to prohibit sex offenders from entering on to public or private school property for any reason
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3288 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3288.pdf |