MA H3431 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mrs. Poirier of North Attleborough, a petition of Elizabeth A. Poirier, Susan Williams Gifford and Shaunna L. O'Connell that county commissioners and the sheriffs for the various counties institute a schedule of fees and assess fees to inmates in their custody. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing sheriffs to impose fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03JointHearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-01JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2685 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2118 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H3353 (Similar To) 2019-11-05 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H2073 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S1432 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S553 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1
H1863 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3304 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback