MA H3451 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of state funds to purchase bottled water. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To promote cost savings through the use of public water
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Claire Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-12-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1736 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2671 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H2671 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3451 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3451.pdf |