MA H3457 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4607

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4607
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to parole. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to parole

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4607
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1502 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S940 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S822 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1371 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2062 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1443 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4607 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback