MA H3539 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4523
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4523
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4523
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the sale of marijuana and medical marijuana. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to medical marijuana patient safety and access
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4523 |
2019-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H3646 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3597 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3647 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1128 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2639
H4523 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3646 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3597 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3647 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1128 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2639
H4523 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3539 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3539.pdf |